NY A06670 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of Hartwick, Otsego county as the "Sergeant John Kempe Winslow Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of Hartwick, Otsego county as the "Sergeant John Kempe Winslow Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Asm. John Salka [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.157 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.498 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a6670b |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1339 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3658B |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3658A |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3658b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.498 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.498 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 6670b |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 6670a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03658 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.157