NY A06671 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends authority to BOCES to lease real property to July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends authority to BOCES to lease real property to July 1, 2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-21Senate3RD READING CAL.709
2019-05-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5323
2019-05-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2019-05-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-08Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.264
2019-05-01Assemblyreported
2019-04-24Assemblyprint number 6671a
2019-04-24Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to education
2019-03-14Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05323 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6671A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06671&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06671&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06671
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06671&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06671A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06671&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06671&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6671#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback