NY A06676 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - advanced to third reading cal.565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - advanced to third reading cal.565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the approval of construction of hospitals or diagnostic treatment centers without regard to public need and financial resource requirements.
Title
Relates to the approval of construction of hospitals or diagnostic treatment centers without regard to public need and financial resource requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.565 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.271 |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | referred to health |