NY A06679 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - print number 6679a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - print number 6679a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for all medical professionals as part of their licensing requirements; requires biennial training in the non-discriminatory provision of medical services for physicians, physician assistants, dentists, dental hygienists, registered and licensed practical nurses, podiatrists, and optometrists; authorizes the department of education to develop the training in consultation with the department of health and other experts; provides for documentation and exemption from the requirements; provides for a public education program on minority health; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Title
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for all medical professionals as part of their licensing requirements; requires biennial training in the non-discriminatory provision of medical services for physicians, physician assistants, dentists, dental hygienists, registered and licensed practical nurses, podiatrists, and optometrists; authorizes the department of education to develop the training in consultation with the department of health and other experts; provides for documentation and exemption from the requirements; provides for a public education program on minority health; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Francisco Moya [D] |
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Assembly | print number 6679a |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00116 (Same As) 2016-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 116A