NY A06679 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-11)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state and requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state and requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.

Sponsors

Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]
Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Daniel Stec [R]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.869
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8805
2020-07-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-20Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.167
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.167
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 6679c
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-02-27Assemblyprint number 6679b
2020-02-27Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 6679a
2019-05-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-03-15Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S01068 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
S05696 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
S08805 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6679C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6679
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06679
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06679A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06679B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06679C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6679#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback