NY A06680 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of municipalities and state agencies.
Title
Relates to the powers of municipalities and state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.242 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.266 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06326 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - referred to energy