NY A06685 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that every banking institution maintaining checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balances.
Title
Provides that every banking institution which maintains checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balance; provides such banks may dishonor check for insufficient funds, but then must honor smaller checks within amounts on deposit in the subject account.
Sponsors
Asm. Joel Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | REFERRED TO BANKS | |
2010-03-22 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-18 | advanced to third reading cal.740 | |
2010-03-16 | reported | |
2010-02-23 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to banks | |
2009-03-11 | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S08146 (Same As) 2010-06-11 - REFERRED TO BANKS