NY A06686 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - signed chap.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - signed chap.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage more participation in the State's agricultural and farmland protection program by farmers, coun- ties and municipalities, and not-for-profits by increasing the State share of the cost of implementing agricultural and farmland protection plans if the proposed match is a landowner contribution.
Title
Increases the maximum percentage for agricultural protection state assistance payments when project costs are contributed by the owner of the agricultural land; provides that payments shall not exceed eighty-seven and one-half percent of the eligible costs of the project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | signed chap.234 | |
2010-07-19 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-16 | 3RD READING CAL.978 | |
2010-06-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5414A | |
2010-06-14 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-14 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-14 | repassed assembly | |
2010-06-08 | amended on third reading 6686a | |
2010-06-08 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-06-08 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-08 | recalled from senate | |
2010-03-03 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE | |
2010-03-03 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-03 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.450 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-11 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-10 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-10 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.144 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.144 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-26 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-11 | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S5414 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6686A