NY A06690 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes numerous modifications to provisions of various laws relating to child custody matters; provides for shared parenting custody; provides for parenting time rather than visitation; provides for mediation and counseling in matrimonial actions involving children; establishes sanctions for interference with parenting time; provides for equality in the burden of child support between parents; bases child support on net income exclusive of income and FICA taxes; provides that child support ceases at age 18; requires contract support collection agents to be audited; deals with DNA evidence when question of paternity; increases parental access to information.
Title
Makes numerous modifications to provisions of various laws relating to child custody matters; provides for shared parenting custody; provides for parenting time rather than visitation; provides for mediation and counseling in matrimonial actions involving children; establishes sanctions for interference with parenting time; provides for equality in the burden of child support between parents; bases child support on net income exclusive of income and FICA taxes; provides that child support ceases at age 18; requires contract support collection agents to be audited; deals with DNA evidence when question of paternity; increases parental access to information.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Asm. Nancy Calhoun [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Tony Jordan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2012-01-20 | Assembly | print number 6690a |
2012-01-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |