NY A06694 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the expiration date of the personal income tax surcharge imposed by the city of Yonkers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the expiration date of the personal income tax surcharge imposed by the city of Yonkers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1214
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4466
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-20Assemblyhome rule request
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.356
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-03-15Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S04466 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6694

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback