NY A06703 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain vessels from the compulsory state pilotage requirement at the discretion of the board of commissioners of pilots.
Title
Exempts certain vessels from the compulsory state pilotage requirement at the discretion of the board of commissioners of pilots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | approval memo.28 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.582 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1816 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4200A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.376 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.376 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 6703a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04200 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - approval memo.28