NY A06710 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.355
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.355
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of corrections and community supervision to place incarcerated parents at correctional institutions and facilities closest to their children's home.
Title
Requires the department of corrections and community supervision to place incarcerated parents at correctional institutions and facilities closest to their children's home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.355 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.220 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S724A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.244 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.428 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | print number 6710a |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00724 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - signed chap.355