NY A06712 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-19 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-19 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the state policy of compensating employees in state service equally for work of comparable value by eliminating wage inequality in job titles which have been segregated by sex, race, or national origin.
Title
Seeks to comply with the federal equal pay act of 1963 by implementing a state policy of compensating employees in state service equally for work of comparable value by eliminating wage inequality in job titles having been segregated by sex, race or national origin; requires the president of the civil service commission to report annually to the legislature and the governor on those segregated titles for which wage disparity exists; mandates governor to appropriate monies to ensure wage disparities are corrected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2010-04-19 | delivered to senate | |
2010-04-19 | passed assembly | |
2010-04-19 | ordered to third reading rules cal.33 | |
2010-04-19 | rules report cal.33 | |
2010-04-19 | reported | |
2010-04-19 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-04-13 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-12 | committed to governmental employees | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.452 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-04-29 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2009-04-29 | delivered to senate | |
2009-04-29 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-23 | advanced to third reading cal.403 | |
2009-04-21 | reported | |
2009-03-24 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-11 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S5271 (Same As) 2010-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE