NY A06714 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to opportunity to ballot committee to receive notices as if such committee was a candidate named on a petition.
Title
Relates to opportunity to ballot committee to receive notices as if such committee was a candidate named on a petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.440 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6714 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.903 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5475 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.377 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05475 (Same As) 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.440