NY A06716 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.318
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.318
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the offense of criminal possession of marihuana in the fifth degree.
Title
Relates to the offense of criminal possession of marihuana in the fifth degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.318 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.335 |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | print number 6716a |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03105 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES