NY A06724 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes optometrists within provisions relating to clinical laboratories.
Title
Includes optometrists within provisions relating to clinical laboratories.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] |
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.444 |
2013-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1172 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5539 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6724b |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.485 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | print number 6724a |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05539 (Same As) 2013-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6724B