NY A06724 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain wineries from the requirement to file annual information returns.
Title
Exempts certain wineries from the requirement to file annual information returns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4668 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.613 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.613 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04668 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.485