NY A06739 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that two cemeteries located in Suffolk county with contiguous or adjacent land dedicated for cemetery purposes and previously operating as public cemetery corporations may merge where their total acreage does not exceed three hundred twenty-five acres.
Title
Provides that two cemeteries located in Suffolk county with contiguous or adjacent land dedicated for cemetery purposes and previously operating as public cemetery corporations may merge where their total acreage does not exceed three hundred twenty-five acres.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.553 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a6739 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.368 |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s3952 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.153 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03952 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.553