NY A06740 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Black youth suicide prevention task force; provides for the number of members, manner of appointment and the topics to be reviewed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Black youth suicide prevention task force; provides for the number of members, manner of appointment and the topics to be reviewed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.300
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4467B
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.549
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.549
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-16Assemblyprint number 6740b
2019-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-21Assemblyprint number 6740a
2019-05-21Assemblyamend and recommit to mental health
2019-03-18Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S04467 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6740B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06740
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06740A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06740B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06740&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6740#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback