NY A06744 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Details the maximum allowable credit that a taxpayer can claim on their tax return under the minimum wage reimbursement credit for taxable years January 1, 2019 through January 1, 2022.
Title
Details the maximum allowable credit that a taxpayer can claim on their tax return under the minimum wage reimbursement credit for taxable years January 1, 2019 through January 1, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |