NY A06747 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - VETOED MEMO.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - VETOED MEMO.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to improving evaluations of the potential impact of rules on jobs and employment opportunities.
Title
Relates to improving evaluations of the potential impact of rules on jobs and employment opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.66 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.358 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a6747a |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.340 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2839A |
2020-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.953 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s2839a |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.358 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | print number 6747a |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02839 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - VETOED MEMO.66