NY A06753 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to exempting income earned by persons under the age of 24 from certain workforce development programs from the determination of need for public assistance programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to exempting income earned by persons under the age of 24 from certain workforce development programs from the determination of need for public assistance programs.

Sponsors

Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]
Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]
Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1633
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6443
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.154
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.154
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-30Assemblyprint number 6753a
2019-05-30Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to social services
2019-03-18Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S06443 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6753A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06753&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06753&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06753
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06753&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06753A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06753&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06753&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06753&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06753&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6753#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback