NY A06782 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to home visiting services for applicants for, or recipients of, public assistance benefits who are exempt from certain work activities; provides criteria for those eligible for such home visiting services.
Title
Relates to home visiting services for applicants for, or recipients of, public assistance benefits who are exempt from certain work activities; provides criteria for those eligible for such home visiting services.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Peter Abbate [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S05810 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES