NY A06812 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a private student loan refinance task force to study and report on ways lending institutions offering private student loans to graduates of institutions of higher education can be encouraged to establish student loan refinancing programs.
Title
Establishes a private student loan refinance task force to study and report on ways lending institutions offering private student loans to graduates of institutions of higher education can be encouraged to establish student loan refinancing programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00250 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - referred to higher education