NY A06832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study relating to the number of emergency room beds in the state and to make recommendations on the minimum number of emergency rooms required per capita and the maximum distance patients shall be expected to travel to access emergency room services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study relating to the number of emergency room beds in the state and to make recommendations on the minimum number of emergency rooms required per capita and the maximum distance patients shall be expected to travel to access emergency room services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s4699
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.380
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.380
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-21Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04699 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback