NY A06835 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-13 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-13 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to service of papers; amends the definition of "mailing" to allow mailing from outside of the state; provides that six days shall be added to a prescribed period when service is made by mail from outside the state; requires a stipulation prior to service by facsimile on an attorney.
Title
Relates to service of papers; amends the definition of "mailing" to allow mailing from outside of the state; provides that six days shall be added to a prescribed period when service is made by mail from outside the state; requires a stipulation prior to service by facsimile on an attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.228 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.231 |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04578 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES