NY A06835 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed podiatrists to certify a temporary disability for purposes of issuance of special vehicle identification parking permits to persons temporarily unable to ambulate without the aid of an assisting device as long as such condition is something he or she treats in the practice of podiatry.
Title
Authorizes licensed podiatrists to certify a temporary disability for purposes of issuance of special vehicle identification parking permits to persons temporarily unable to ambulate without the aid of an assisting device as long as such condition is something he or she treats in the practice of podiatry.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 6835a |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |