NY A06842 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibited locations for new retail electronic cigarette stores and tobacco businesses.
Title
Relates to prohibited locations for new retail electronic cigarette stores and tobacco businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 6842a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04249 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES