NY A06856 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - signed chap.19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - signed chap.19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment.
Title
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Senate | signed chap.19 |
2011-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.493 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4493 |
2011-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.270 |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-26 | Assembly | print number 6856a |
2011-04-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2011-04-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S04493 (Same As) 2011-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6856A