NY A06856 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - advanced to third reading cal.606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - advanced to third reading cal.606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections.
Title
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.606 |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.272 |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03285 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES