NY A06856 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing the enhanced residential care benefit for aged, blind and disabled persons by increasing the rate of the social security income payment for eligible individuals receiving enhanced residential care; provides for a $4.00 per day increase on each of the following five dates: July 1, 2019; April 1, 2020; April 1, 2021; April 1, 2022; and April 1, 2023; for a total increase of $20.00 per day over five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing the enhanced residential care benefit for aged, blind and disabled persons by increasing the rate of the social security income payment for eligible individuals receiving enhanced residential care; provides for a $4.00 per day increase on each of the following five dates: July 1, 2019; April 1, 2020; April 1, 2021; April 1, 2022; and April 1, 2023; for a total increase of $20.00 per day over five years.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22Assemblyreferred to social services

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback