NY A06865 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties to maintain a confidential registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.
Title
Requires counties to maintain a confidential registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.479 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.452 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S09067 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES