NY A06865 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain lands in New York City to the urban development corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain lands in New York City to the urban development corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08Senate3RD READING CAL.413
2019-05-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4688A
2019-05-07SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-05-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-07Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.61
2019-05-07Assemblyrules report cal.61
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-05-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-02Assemblyprint number 6865a
2019-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-05-02Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2019-03-22Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S04688 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6865A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06865&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06865&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06865
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06865&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06865A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06865&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06865&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06865&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6865#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback