NY A06869 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - substituted by s4006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - substituted by s4006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the applicable interest rate for calculating certain benefits provided by the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Title
Relates to the applicable interest rate for calculating certain benefits provided by the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s4006 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.258 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.258 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04006 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.479