NY A06869 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts Howlett Hill Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts Howlett Hill Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30Senate3RD READING CAL.561
2019-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4518
2019-05-22SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.357
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-03-22Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S04518 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6869

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback