NY A06870 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts East Syracuse Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts East Syracuse Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.560
2019-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4517
2019-04-08SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-04-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-08Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.172
2019-04-02Assemblyreported
2019-03-22Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S04517 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6870

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback