NY A06880 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - print number 6880a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - print number 6880a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes guidelines for granting contracts to disabled veterans eligible under the access to home for heroes program.
Title
Authorizes guidelines for granting contracts to disabled veterans eligible under the access to home for heroes program.
Sponsors
Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Assembly | print number 6880a |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S03933 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 3933C