NY A06884 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons selling or offering to sell weight loss services or weight loss products to provide consumers with a weight loss and dieting information notice; sets forth such notice shall include the dangers of rapid weight loss, dieting information, and risks associated with certain medications used with weight loss programs; delineates deceptive practices; provides for penalties, including fines and injunctions; further provides for attorney general enforcement.
Title
Requires persons selling or offering to sell weight loss services or weight loss products to provide consumers with a weight loss and dieting information notice; sets forth such notice shall include the dangers of rapid weight loss, dieting information, and risks associated with certain medications used with weight loss programs; delineates deceptive practices; provides for penalties, including fines and injunctions; further provides for attorney general enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.247 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.306 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08876 (Same As) 2020-08-05 - REFERRED TO RULES