NY A06901 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s3263a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s3263a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the Fair Harbor fire district as among those districts that have elections on the second Tuesday in July.
Title
Includes the Fair Harbor fire district as among those districts that have elections on the second Tuesday in July.
Sponsors
Asm. Alfred Graf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s3263a |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.275 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03263 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.334