NY A06901 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-10 - substituted by s4281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-10 - substituted by s4281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the supervision of real estate appraiser assistants.
Title
Relates to the supervision of real estate appraiser assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4281 |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.491 |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04281 (Same As) 2013-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.88