NY A06901 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the licensure of private proprietary schools.
Title
Extends the licensure of private proprietary schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | signed chap.120 |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5037 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.214 |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05037 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6901