NY A06916 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.174
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.174
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption at the New York state fair.
Title
Relates to the sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption at the New York state fair.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.174 |
2019-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.382 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6916b |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4812B |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.652 |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4812A |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4812b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.382 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.382 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 6916b |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | print number 6916a |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04812 (Same As) 2019-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.174