NY A06928 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates uniformed court officers in the town of Ossining, county of Westchester as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates uniformed court officers in the town of Ossining, county of Westchester as peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.332
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1840
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5862A
2018-03-21SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2018-03-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-21Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.483
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.596
2017-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.596
2017-06-20Assemblyreported
2017-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-18Assemblyprint number 6928a
2017-06-18Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2017-03-24Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S05862 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6928A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06928&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06928&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06928
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06928&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06928A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06928&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06928&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06928&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6928#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback