NY A06962 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of health to establish obstetric hemorrhage protocols to be implemented by hospitals; requires reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of health to establish obstetric hemorrhage protocols to be implemented by hospitals; requires reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-09Senate3RD READING CAL.396
2019-04-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4498A
2019-04-08SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-04-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-08Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.173
2019-04-02Assemblyreported
2019-03-27Assemblyprint number 6962a
2019-03-27Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-03-27Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04498 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6962A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06962&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06962&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06962
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06962&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06962A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06962&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06962&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6962#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback