NY A06963 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.278
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes the Ferguson, Moyer, Mud Creek, Ninemile Creek, Oriskany, Reall, Sauquoit, Six Mile Creek, and Wood Creek as creeks within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes the Ferguson, Moyer, Mud Creek, Ninemile Creek, Oriskany, Reall, Sauquoit, Six Mile Creek, and Wood Creek as creeks within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13Senatesigned chap.278
2019-09-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.227
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2906A
2019-05-30SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-22Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 6963a
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.358
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-28Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02906 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6963A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06963&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06963&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06963
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06963&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06963A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06963&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06963&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06963&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6963#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback