NY A06965 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - signed chap.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - signed chap.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the collective bargaining agreement between the state of New York and the police benevolent association of the New York state troopers, Inc. for 2018-2023; provides for the terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of troopers in the division of state police and the salary schedules for such members (Part A); provides for the terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of commissioned and non-commissioned officers of the division of state police and the salary schedules for members of such unit (Part B); relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees who are members of security services collective negotiating unit; authorizes funding of joint labor-management committees (Part C); and relates to the salaries of certain state officers and employees excluded from collective negotiating units (Part D); makes appropriations therefor.
Title
Relates to the collective bargaining agreement between the state of New York and the police benevolent association of the New York state troopers, Inc. for 2018-2023; provides for the terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of troopers in the division of state police and the salary schedules for such members (Part A); provides for the terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of commissioned and non-commissioned officers of the division of state police and the salary schedules for members of such unit (Part B); relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees who are members of security services collective negotiating unit; authorizes funding of joint labor-management committees (Part C); and relates to the salaries of certain state officers and employees excluded from collective negotiating units (Part D); makes appropriations therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | signed chap.24 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.365 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4936 |
2019-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.47 |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.47 |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04936 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - signed chap.24