NY A06971 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s218b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring anaphylactic policies for child care services setting forth guidelines and procedures to be followed for both the prevention of anaphylaxis and during a medical emergency resulting from anaphylaxis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring anaphylactic policies for child care services setting forth guidelines and procedures to be followed for both the prevention of anaphylaxis and during a medical emergency resulting from anaphylaxis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s218b
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.157
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.157
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 6971b
2019-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-04-03Assemblyprint number 6971a
2019-04-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2019-03-29Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S00218 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.254

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06971&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06971&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06971
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06971&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06971A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06971&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06971B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06971&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06971&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06971&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback