NY A06977 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the establishment of an appeals process for students who are denied the state resident tuition rate at any public university or college.
Title
Requires the establishment of an appeals process for students who are denied the state resident tuition rate at any public university or college.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6977a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.488 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.454 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S03629 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION