NY A06980 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificates to a charitable bail organization to deposit money as bail under certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to certificates to a charitable bail organization to deposit money as bail under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.205 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.359 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | substituted for a6980 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.460 |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | substituted by s494 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.359 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00494 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.205