NY A06985 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a certificate of merit in proceedings to recover possession of real property; requires the petition shall be accompanied by a certificate, signed by the attorney for the petitioner, certifying that the attorney has reviewed the facts of the case and that, based on consultation with representatives of the petitioner identified in the certificate and the attorney's review of pertinent documents, there is a reasonable basis for the commencement of such action; and provides that where a petitioner willfully fails to provide copies of required papers and documents the court may dismiss the petition without prejudice.
Title
Relates to requiring a certificate of merit in proceedings to recover possession of real property; requires the petition shall be accompanied by a certificate, signed by the attorney for the petitioner, certifying that the attorney has reviewed the facts of the case and that, based on consultation with representatives of the petitioner identified in the certificate and the attorney's review of pertinent documents, there is a reasonable basis for the commencement of such action; and provides that where a petitioner willfully fails to provide copies of required papers and documents the court may dismiss the petition without prejudice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.250 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6985b |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.537 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | print number 6985a |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04723 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY